Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB854 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/08/2017

                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 854
 (In the Senate - Filed February 13, 2017;
 February 27, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; March 8, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0;
 March 8, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 854 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchase of food and beverages by the Texas Division
 of Emergency Management for certain persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 418.052, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 418.052.  USE OF FUNDS TO SUPPORT CERTAIN PERSONS
 [DIVISION PERSONNEL]. The division may use appropriated funds to
 purchase food and beverages for a person [division personnel] who
 is [are]:
 (1)  activated to provide services in response to an
 emergency situation, an incident, or a disaster; and
 (2)  unable to leave or required to remain at the
 person's [their] assignment area [areas] due to the emergency
 situation, incident, or disaster.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *