Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB864 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/21/2017

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 864
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017; February 27, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water &
 Rural Affairs; March 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for obtaining a right to use state water
 if the applicant proposes an alternative source of water that is not
 state water.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 11.132(c) and (d), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  In the notice, the commission shall:
 (1)  state the name and address of the applicant;
 (2)  state the date the application was filed;
 (3)  state the purpose and extent of the proposed
 appropriation of water;
 (4)  identify the source of supply and the place where
 the water is to be stored or taken or diverted from the source of
 supply;
 (5)  identify any proposed alternative source of water,
 other than state water, identified by the applicant;
 (6)  specify the time and location where the commission
 will consider the application; and
 (7) [(6)]  give any additional information the
 commission considers necessary.
 (d)  The commission may act on the application without
 holding a public hearing if:
 (1)  not less than 30 days before the date of action on
 the application by the commission, the applicant has published the
 commission's notice of the application at least once in a newspaper
 regularly published or circulated within the section of the state
 where the source of water is located;
 (2)  not less than 30 days before the date of action on
 the application by the commission, the commission mails a copy of
 the notice by first-class mail, postage prepaid, to:
 (A)  each claimant or appropriator of water from
 the source of water supply, the record of whose claim or
 appropriation has been filed with the commission; [and]
 (B)  each groundwater conservation district with
 jurisdiction over the proposed groundwater production, if the
 applicant proposes to use groundwater from a well located within a
 groundwater conservation district as an alternative source of
 water; and
 (C)  all navigation districts within the river
 basin concerned; and
 (3)  within 30 days after the date of the newspaper
 publication of the commission's notice, a public hearing has not
 been requested in writing by a commissioner, the executive
 director, or an affected person who objects to the application.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.135(b), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The permit shall be in writing and attested by the seal
 of the commission, and it shall contain substantially the following
 information:
 (1)  the name of the person to whom the permit is
 issued;
 (2)  the date the permit is issued;
 (3)  the date the original application was filed;
 (4)  the use or purpose for which the appropriation is
 to be made;
 (5)  the amount or volume of water authorized to be
 appropriated for each purpose; if use of the appropriated water is
 authorized for multiple purposes, the permit shall contain a
 special condition limiting the total amount of water that may
 actually be diverted for all of the purposes to the amount of water
 appropriated;
 (6)  a general description of the source of supply from
 which the appropriation is proposed to be made, including any
 alternative source of water that is not state water;
 (7)  the time within which construction or work must
 begin and the time within which it must be completed; and
 (8)  any other information the commission prescribes.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 11.143(e) and (f), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  In the notice, the commission shall:
 (1)  state the name and post-office address of the
 applicant;
 (2)  state the date the application was filed;
 (3)  state the purpose and extent of the proposed
 appropriation of water;
 (4)  identify the source of supply, including any
 proposed alternative source of water, other than state water,
 identified by the applicant, and the place where the water is
 stored; and
 (5)  specify the time and place of the hearing.
 (f)  The notice shall be published only once, at least 20
 days before the date stated in the notice for the hearing on the
 application, in a newspaper having general circulation in the
 county where the dam or reservoir is located. At least 15 days
 before the date set for the hearing, the commission shall transmit a
 copy of the notice by first-class mail to each person whose claim or
 appropriation has been filed with the commission and whose
 diversion point is downstream from that described in the
 application.  If the notice identifies groundwater from a well
 located in a groundwater conservation district as a proposed
 alternative source of water, the notice shall be:
 (1)  sent to the groundwater conservation district in
 which the well is located; and
 (2)  published, at least 20 days before the date stated
 in the notice for the hearing, in a newspaper having general
 circulation in each county in which the groundwater district is
 located.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for a new or amended water right received by the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on or after the effective
 date of this Act. An application received before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 application was received, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *