Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB884 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/22/2017

                    By: Whitmire, et al. S.B. No. 884
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017; February 28, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 22, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 March 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 884 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain counties to use county revenue
 or incur debt to improve or redevelop certain sports facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 330, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 330.002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 330.002.  LIMITATION ON AUTHORITY OF CERTAIN COUNTIES
 TO IMPROVE OR REDEVELOP CERTAIN SPORTS FACILITIES. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "County revenue" includes revenue from property
 taxes, hotel occupancy taxes, fees, and fines.
 (2)  "Obsolete sports facility" means a multipurpose
 arena, coliseum, or stadium designed to be used in part as a venue
 for professional sports events and that opened to the public before
 1966.
 (b)  This section applies only to a county with a population
 of 3.3 million or more.
 (c)  A county may not fund, in whole or in part, the
 improvement or redevelopment of an obsolete sports facility with
 county revenue or debt if the improvement or redevelopment will
 cost $10 million or more, unless the funding is approved by the
 voters of the county at an election held for that purpose.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *