Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB885 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 885
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017; February 28, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 1, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 1, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 885 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maximum number of semester credit hours allowed for
 and funding sources used to supplement a TEXAS grant and to the
 removal of obsolete references related to the Teach for Texas grant
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter M, Chapter 56, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 56.3051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 56.3051.  MAXIMUM NUMBER OF SEMESTER CREDIT HOURS.  A
 person may not receive a TEXAS grant for more than the lesser of:
 (1)  135 semester credit hours or the equivalent; or
 (2)  15 semester credit hours, or the equivalent, in
 addition to the number of credit hours needed to complete the
 student's degree program.
 SECTION 2.  Section 56.307, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  A public institution of higher education shall use other
 available sources of financial aid, other than a loan or work study,
 to cover any difference in the amount of a TEXAS grant awarded to
 the student and the actual amount of tuition and required fees at
 the institution if the difference results from:
 (1)  a reduction in the amount of a TEXAS grant under
 Subsection (i-1); or
 (2)  a deficiency in the amount of the grant as
 established under Subsection (a) or (e), as applicable, to cover
 the full amount of tuition and required fees charged to the student
 by the institution.
 SECTION 3.  Section 56.308(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Each school district shall:
 (1)  notify its middle school students, junior high
 school students, and high school students, those students' teachers
 and school counselors, and those students' parents of the TEXAS
 grant program [and Teach for Texas grant programs], the eligibility
 requirements of the [each] program, the need for students to make
 informed curriculum choices to be prepared for success beyond high
 school, and sources of information on higher education admissions
 and financial aid in a manner that assists the district in
 implementing a strategy adopted by the district under Section
 11.252(a)(4); and
 (2)  ensure that each student's official transcript or
 diploma indicates whether the student has completed or is on
 schedule to complete:
 (A)  the recommended or advanced high school
 curriculum required for grant eligibility under Section 28.002 or
 28.025; or
 (B)  for a school district covered by Section
 56.304(f)(1), the required portion of the recommended or advanced
 high school curriculum in the manner described by Section
 56.304(f)(2).
 SECTION 4.  Sections 56.311(a), (b), (c), (c-1), (e), and
 (g), Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Legislative Oversight Committee on the TEXAS grant
 program [and Teach for Texas grant program] is composed of six
 members as follows:
 (1)  three members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor; and
 (2)  three members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
 (b)  The committee shall:
 (1)  meet at least twice a year with the coordinating
 board; and
 (2)  receive information regarding rules relating to
 the TEXAS grant program [and Teach for Texas grant program] that
 have been adopted by the coordinating board or proposed for
 adoption by the coordinating board.
 (c)  The committee may request reports and other information
 from the coordinating board relating to the operation of the TEXAS
 grant program [and Teach for Texas grant program] by the
 coordinating board.
 (c-1)  The [Not later than September 1 of each year, the]
 coordinating board shall include in its annual report to the
 legislature on financial aid in this state [provide] a report to the
 committee regarding the operation of the TEXAS grant program,
 including information from the three preceding state fiscal years
 as follows:
 (1)  allocations of TEXAS grants by eligible
 institution, disaggregated by initial and subsequent awards;
 (2)  the number of TEXAS grants awarded to students
 disaggregated by race, ethnicity, and expected family
 contribution;
 (3)  disaggregated as required by Subdivision (2) and
 reported both on a statewide basis and for each eligible
 institution, the number of TEXAS grants awarded to students who
 meet:
 (A)  only the eligibility criteria described by
 Section 56.304; or
 (B)  the eligibility criteria described by
 Section 56.3041(2)(A); and
 (4)  the persistence, retention, and graduation rates
 of students receiving TEXAS grants.
 (e)  The committee shall monitor the operation of the TEXAS
 grant program [and Teach for Texas grant program], with emphasis on
 the manner of the award of grants, the number of grants awarded, and
 the educational progress made by persons who have received grants
 under the program [those programs].
 (g)  The report shall include identification of any problems
 in the TEXAS grant program [and Teach for Texas grant program] with
 recommended solutions for the coordinating board and for
 legislative action.
 SECTION 5.  Section 56.304(d), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  The changes in law made by this Act apply
 beginning with initial or subsequent TEXAS grants awarded for the
 2018 fall semester.  Initial or subsequent TEXAS grants awarded for
 a semester or term before the 2018 fall semester are governed by the
 applicable law in effect immediately before the effective date of
 this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *