Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB908 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 908
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2017; February 28, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; May 3, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 908 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of medical supply transport vehicles
 during a declared state of disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 546, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C.  OPERATION OF MEDICAL SUPPLY TRANSPORT VEHICLES
 Sec. 546.051.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Emergency care facility" means a health care
 facility, including a freestanding emergency medical care
 facility, hospital, temporary emergency clinic, and trauma
 facility, that provides emergency medical care.
 (2)  "Freestanding emergency medical care facility"
 means a facility licensed under Chapter 254, Health and Safety
 Code.
 (3)  "Medical supply distributor" means a person
 authorized to transport prescription drugs and other medical
 supplies to emergency care facilities or pharmacies.
 (4)  "Nursing home" means a facility licensed under
 Chapter 242, Health and Safety Code.
 (5)  "Pharmacy" has the meaning assigned by Section
 551.003, Occupations Code.
 (6)  "Trauma facility" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 773.003, Health and Safety Code.
 Sec. 546.052.  MEDICAL SUPPLY TRANSPORT VEHICLES DURING
 DECLARED DISASTER. (a)  A vehicle used by a medical supply
 distributor to transport prescription drugs and other medical
 supplies to an emergency care facility, pharmacy, or nursing home
 located in an area declared a disaster area by the governor under
 Chapter 418, Government Code, may have access to highways, streets,
 and bridges as if the transport vehicle were an emergency vehicle if
 the transport vehicle will not negatively impact evacuation
 activities or any response or recovery activities in the disaster
 area.
 (b)  The Texas Division of Emergency Management shall
 establish procedures to assist medical supply distributors in
 accessing highways, streets, and bridges as authorized by
 Subsection (a).
 (c)  This section does not create a cause of action against a
 law enforcement officer involved in assisting a medical supply
 distributor under this section for any harm done to the distributor
 resulting from that assistance.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2018, the Texas
 Division of Emergency Management shall establish the procedures
 required by Section 546.052(b), Transportation Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *