Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB91 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/23/2017

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 91
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 24, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 23, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; March 23, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 91 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of automatic license plate readers by a law
 enforcement agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.0094 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.0094.  AUTOMATIC LICENSE PLATE READER. (a)  In
 this section, "automatic license plate reader" means a system that
 reads and records license plate numbers taken from digital
 photographs.
 (b)  A law enforcement agency may use an automatic license
 plate reader.
 (c)  Images and any related data produced from an automatic
 license plate reader under Subsection (b) may be used only for the
 following law enforcement purposes:
 (1)  investigating a criminal offense; or
 (2)  investigating a report of a missing person.
 (d)  All images and data produced from an automatic license
 plate reader under this section shall be destroyed not later than
 the first anniversary of the date of collection unless the image or
 data is evidence in a criminal investigation or prosecution.
 (e)  The department shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *