Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB911 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/03/2017

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 911
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2017; February 28, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the form of a marriage license and an application for a
 marriage license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2.009, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  A license issued by a county clerk under this section
 must identify the county in which the license is issued but may not
 specify the name of the county clerk.
 SECTION 2.  Section 194.0011(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The executive commissioner by rule shall prescribe the
 format and content of the department form used for the marriage
 license application. The form:
 (1)  may not require that the name of the county clerk
 appear on the application; and
 (2)  must require identification of the county in which
 the application is submitted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *