Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB922 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 922


 AN ACT
 relating to the reimbursement of certain providers under the
 Medicaid program for the provision of telehealth services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02171 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02171.  REIMBURSEMENT FOR CERTAIN TELEHEALTH
 SERVICES.  (a)  In this section, "health professional" means an
 individual who is:
 (1)  licensed, registered, certified, or otherwise
 authorized by this state to practice as a social worker,
 occupational therapist, or speech-language pathologist;
 (2)  a licensed professional counselor;
 (3)  a licensed marriage and family therapist; or
 (4)  a licensed specialist in school psychology.
 (b)  The commission shall ensure that Medicaid reimbursement
 is provided to a school district or open-enrollment charter school
 for telehealth services provided through the school district or
 charter school by a health professional, even if the health
 professional is not the patient's primary care provider, if:
 (1)  the school district or charter school is an
 authorized health care provider under Medicaid; and
 (2)  the parent or legal guardian of the patient
 provides consent before the service is provided.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 922 passed the Senate on
 May 1, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 922 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 135,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor