Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB942 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2017

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 942
 (In the Senate - Filed February 16, 2017; March 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; March 29, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0, 1 present not voting; March 29, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 942 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.101, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (n) to read as follows:
 (n)  In addition to other authorized uses, a municipality
 that has a population of not more than 1,500 and is located in a
 county that borders Arkansas and Louisiana may use revenue from the
 municipal hotel occupancy tax for the promotion of tourism by the
 enhancement and upgrading of an existing sports facility or field
 as specified by Subsection (a)(7), provided that the requirements
 of Subsections (a)(7)(A) and (C) and Section 351.1076 are met.
 SECTION 2.  Section 351.1076(a), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A municipality that spends municipal hotel occupancy
 tax revenue for the enhancement and upgrading of existing sports
 facilities or fields as authorized by Section 351.101(a)(7) or (n):
 (1)  shall determine the amount of municipal hotel
 occupancy tax revenue generated for the municipality by hotel
 activity attributable to the sports events and tournaments held on
 the enhanced or upgraded facilities or fields for five years after
 the date the enhancements and upgrades are completed; and
 (2)  may not spend hotel occupancy tax revenue for the
 enhancement and upgrading of the facilities or fields in a total
 amount that exceeds the amount of area hotel revenue attributable
 to the enhancements and upgrades.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *