Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB957 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell, Hinojosa S.B. No. 957
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2017; March 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the numbering of propositions on the ballot.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 52.095, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 52.095.  PROPOSITIONS. (a)  Except as otherwise
 provided by law, the authority ordering an election in which more
 than one measure is to be voted on shall determine the order in
 which the propositions are to appear on the ballot.
 (b)  Each political subdivision's proposition on the ballot
 shall be assigned a unique number on the ballot.
 (c)  The secretary of state shall prescribe procedures
 necessary to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *