Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB968 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 968
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2017; March 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 29, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 29, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 968 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring certain public and private institutions of
 higher education to provide students and employees an option to
 electronically report certain offenses to the institution.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9365 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9365.  ELECTRONIC REPORTING OPTION FOR CERTAIN
 OFFENSES.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Dating violence" means abuse or violence, or a
 threat of abuse or violence, against a person with whom the actor
 has or has had a social relationship of a romantic or intimate
 nature.
 (2)  "Postsecondary educational institution" means an
 institution of higher education or a private or independent
 institution of higher education, as those terms are defined by
 Section 61.003.
 (3)  "Sexual assault" means sexual contact or
 intercourse with a person without the person's consent, including
 sexual contact or intercourse against the person's will or in a
 circumstance in which the person is incapable of consenting to the
 contact or intercourse.
 (4)  "Sexual harassment" means unwelcome, sex-based
 verbal or physical conduct that:
 (A)  in the employment context, unreasonably
 interferes with an employee's work performance or creates an
 intimidating, hostile, or offensive work environment; or
 (B)  in the education context, is sufficiently
 severe, persistent, or pervasive that the conduct interferes with a
 student's ability to participate in or benefit from educational
 programs or activities.
 (5)  "Stalking" means a course of conduct directed at a
 person that would cause a reasonable person to fear for the person's
 safety or to suffer substantial emotional distress.
 (b)  Each postsecondary educational institution shall
 provide an option for a student enrolled at or an employee of the
 institution to electronically report to the institution an
 allegation of sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence,
 or stalking committed against or witnessed by the student or
 employee, regardless of the location at which the alleged offense
 occurred.
 (c)  The electronic reporting option provided under
 Subsection (b) must:
 (1)  enable a student or employee to report the alleged
 offense anonymously; and
 (2)  be easily accessible through a clearly
 identifiable link on the postsecondary educational institution's
 Internet website home page.
 (d)  A protocol for reporting sexual assault adopted under
 Section 51.9363 must comply with this section.
 (e)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board may adopt
 rules as necessary to administer this section.
 (f)  The commissioner of higher education shall establish an
 advisory committee to recommend to the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board rules for adoption under Subsection (e).  The
 advisory committee consists of nine members appointed by the
 commissioner.  Each member must be a chief executive officer of a
 postsecondary educational institution or a representative
 designated by that officer.  Not later than December 1, 2017, the
 advisory committee shall submit the committee's recommendations to
 the coordinating board.  This subsection expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2018, each public or
 private postsecondary educational institution shall provide the
 electronic reporting option required under Section 51.9365,
 Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *