Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB968 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 968


 AN ACT
 relating to a sexual assault policy at certain public and private
 institutions of higher education and to requiring those
 institutions to provide students and employees an option to
 electronically report certain offenses to the institution.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.9363, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9363.  [CAMPUS] SEXUAL ASSAULT POLICY. (a)  In this
 section, "postsecondary educational institution" means an
 ["]institution of higher education or a private or independent
 institution of higher education, as those terms are defined[" has
 the meaning assigned] by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each postsecondary educational institution [of higher
 education] shall adopt a policy on [campus] sexual assault
 applicable to each student enrolled at and each employee of the
 institution.  The policy must:
 (1)  include:
 (A)  definitions of prohibited behavior;
 (B)  sanctions for violations; and
 (C)  the protocol for reporting and responding to
 reports of [campus] sexual assault; and
 (2)  be approved by the institution's governing board
 before final adoption by the institution.
 (c)  Each postsecondary educational institution [of higher
 education] shall make the institution's [campus] sexual assault
 policy available to students, faculty, and staff members by:
 (1)  including the policy in the institution's student
 handbook and personnel handbook; and
 (2)  creating and maintaining a web page on the
 institution's Internet website dedicated solely to the policy.
 (d)  Each postsecondary educational institution [of higher
 education] shall require each entering freshman or undergraduate
 transfer student to attend an orientation on the institution's
 [campus] sexual assault policy before or during the first semester
 or term in which the student is enrolled at the institution.  The
 institution shall establish the format and content of the
 orientation.
 (e)  Each postsecondary educational institution shall
 develop and implement a public awareness campaign to inform
 students enrolled at and employees of the institution of the
 institution's sexual assault policy.  As part of the campaign, the
 institution shall provide to students information regarding the
 protocol for reporting incidents of sexual assault adopted under
 Subsection (b), including the name, office location, and contact
 information of the institution's Title IX coordinator, by:
 (1)  e-mailing the information to each student at the
 beginning of each semester or other academic term; and
 (2)  including the information in the orientation
 required under Subsection (d).
 (f)  As part of the protocol for responding to reports of
 sexual assault adopted under Subsection (b), each postsecondary
 educational institution shall:
 (1)  to the greatest extent practicable based on the
 number of counselors employed by the institution, ensure that each
 alleged victim or alleged perpetrator of an incident of sexual
 assault and any other person who reports such an incident are
 offered counseling provided by a counselor who does not provide
 counseling to any other person involved in the incident; and
 (2)  notwithstanding any other law, allow an alleged
 victim or alleged perpetrator of an incident of sexual assault to
 drop a course in which both parties are enrolled without any
 academic penalty.
 (g)  Each biennium, each postsecondary educational
 institution [of higher education] shall review the institution's
 [campus] sexual assault policy and, with approval of the
 institution's governing board, revise the policy as necessary.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9365 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9365.  ELECTRONIC REPORTING OPTION FOR CERTAIN
 OFFENSES.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Dating violence" means abuse or violence, or a
 threat of abuse or violence, against a person with whom the actor
 has or has had a social relationship of a romantic or intimate
 nature.
 (2)  "Postsecondary educational institution" means an
 institution of higher education or a private or independent
 institution of higher education, as those terms are defined by
 Section 61.003.
 (3)  "Sexual assault" means sexual contact or
 intercourse with a person without the person's consent, including
 sexual contact or intercourse against the person's will or in a
 circumstance in which the person is incapable of consenting to the
 contact or intercourse.
 (4)  "Sexual harassment" means unwelcome, sex-based
 verbal or physical conduct that:
 (A)  in the employment context, unreasonably
 interferes with an employee's work performance or creates an
 intimidating, hostile, or offensive work environment; or
 (B)  in the education context, is sufficiently
 severe, persistent, or pervasive that the conduct interferes with a
 student's ability to participate in or benefit from educational
 programs or activities.
 (5)  "Stalking" means a course of conduct directed at a
 person that would cause a reasonable person to fear for the person's
 safety or to suffer substantial emotional distress.
 (b)  Each postsecondary educational institution shall
 provide an option for a student enrolled at or an employee of the
 institution to electronically report to the institution an
 allegation of sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence,
 or stalking committed against or witnessed by the student or
 employee, regardless of the location at which the alleged offense
 occurred.
 (c)  The electronic reporting option provided under
 Subsection (b) must:
 (1)  enable a student or employee to report the alleged
 offense anonymously; and
 (2)  be easily accessible through a clearly
 identifiable link on the postsecondary educational institution's
 Internet website home page.
 (d)  A protocol for reporting sexual assault adopted under
 Section 51.9363 must comply with this section.
 (e)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board may adopt
 rules as necessary to administer this section.
 (f)  The commissioner of higher education shall establish an
 advisory committee to recommend to the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board rules for adoption under Subsection (e).  The
 advisory committee consists of nine members appointed by the
 commissioner.  Each member must be a chief executive officer of a
 postsecondary educational institution or a representative
 designated by that officer.  Not later than December 1, 2017, the
 advisory committee shall submit the committee's recommendations to
 the coordinating board.  This subsection expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  Section 51.9363, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2017-2018 academic year.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 1, 2018, each public or
 private postsecondary educational institution shall provide the
 electronic reporting option required under Section 51.9365,
 Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 968 passed the Senate on
 April 10, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 968 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 124,
 Nays 12, one present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 120, Nays 27, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor