Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB969 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 969


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring certain public and private institutions of
 higher education to provide amnesty to students who report certain
 incidents, including sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating
 violence, or stalking.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9366 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9366.  AMNESTY FOR STUDENTS REPORTING CERTAIN
 INCIDENTS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (2)  "Dating violence" means abuse or violence, or a
 threat of abuse or violence, against a person with whom the actor
 has or has had a social relationship of a romantic or intimate
 nature.
 (3)  "Postsecondary educational institution" means an
 institution of higher education or a private or independent
 institution of higher education, as those terms are defined by
 Section 61.003.
 (4)  "Sexual assault" means sexual contact or
 intercourse with a person without the person's consent, including
 sexual contact or intercourse against the person's will or in a
 circumstance in which the person is incapable of consenting to the
 contact or intercourse.
 (5)  "Sexual harassment" means unwelcome, sex-based
 verbal or physical conduct that:
 (A)  in the employment context, unreasonably
 interferes with a person's work performance or creates an
 intimidating, hostile, or offensive work environment; or
 (B)  in the education context, is sufficiently
 severe, persistent, or pervasive that the conduct interferes with a
 student's ability to participate in or benefit from educational
 programs or activities at a postsecondary educational institution.
 (6)  "Stalking" means a course of conduct directed at a
 person that would cause a reasonable person to fear for the person's
 safety or to suffer substantial emotional distress.
 (b)  A postsecondary educational institution may not take
 any disciplinary action against a student enrolled at the
 institution who in good faith reports to the institution being the
 victim of, or a witness to, an incident of sexual harassment, sexual
 assault, dating violence, or stalking for a violation by the
 student of the institution's code of conduct occurring at or near
 the time of the incident, regardless of the location at which the
 incident occurred or the outcome of the institution's disciplinary
 process regarding the incident, if any.
 (c)  A postsecondary educational institution may investigate
 to determine whether a report of an incident of sexual harassment,
 sexual assault, dating violence, or stalking was made in good
 faith.
 (d)  A determination that a student is entitled to amnesty
 under Subsection (b) is final and may not be revoked.
 (e)  Subsection (b) does not apply to a student who reports
 the student's own commission or assistance in the commission of
 sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, or stalking.
 (f)  This section may not be construed to limit a
 postsecondary educational institution's ability to provide amnesty
 from application of the institution's policies in circumstances not
 described by Subsection (b).
 (g)  The coordinating board may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement and enforce this section.
 (h)  The commissioner of higher education shall establish an
 advisory committee to recommend to the coordinating board rules for
 adoption under Subsection (g).  The advisory committee consists of
 nine members appointed by the commissioner.  Each member must be a
 chief executive officer of a postsecondary educational institution
 or a representative designated by that officer.  Not later than
 December 1, 2017, the advisory committee shall submit the
 committee's recommendations to the coordinating board.  This
 subsection expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.9366, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2018 spring semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 969 passed the Senate on
 April 10, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 969 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 129,
 Nays 7, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor