Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR12 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/14/2016

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffines S.J.R. No. 12


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment requiring the establishment
 of limits on the number of terms judges and justices may serve on
 courts in this state.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article V, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 32 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.  (a)  The legislature by general law shall require
 the Supreme Court, in consultation with the Court of Criminal
 Appeals, to establish a limit on the number of terms a judge or
 justice may be elected to serve as a judge or justice of a court
 established under this article, by the legislature under general
 law, or by the governing body of a municipality by ordinance.
 (b)  A judge or justice who has been elected to serve on a
 court for the maximum number of terms established by the Supreme
 Court, in consultation with the Court of Criminal Appeals, as
 required by Subsection (a) of this section is not eligible for
 election to serve an additional term on that court.
 (c)  The term of a person appointed to serve on a court for
 the remainder of a term or to fill a vacancy on the court is not
 counted in determining whether the person is eligible to serve
 under Subsection (b) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2017, requiring the legislature by general law to
 require the Supreme Court, in consultation with the Court of
 Criminal Appeals, to establish a limit on the number of terms a
 judge or justice may serve on a court in this state.
 (b)  The Supreme Court shall establish the limit as required
 by the general law enacted under Subsection (a) of this temporary
 provision not later than December 1, 2018.
 (c)  A term that begins before January 1, 2019, is not
 counted in determining whether a judge or justice is eligible to
 serve on a court under Section 32, Article V, of this constitution.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires February 1, 2039.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment requiring the
 legislature to establish term limits for judges and justices
 serving on courts in this state."