Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR27 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/22/2017

                    By: Taylor of Collin S.J.R. No. 27
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment repealing county authority to
 provide for manual labor poor houses and farms.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 14, Article IX, Texas Constitution, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment repealing county
 authority to provide for manual labor poor houses and farms."
 * * * * *