Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR918 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

                    85R33552 YDB-D
 By: Creighton S.R. No. 918


 R E S O L U T I O N
 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, That Senate Rule 12.03 be
 suspended in part as provided by Senate Rule 12.08 to enable the
 conference committee appointed to resolve the differences on Senate
 Bill 1289 (the purchase of iron and steel products made in the
 United States for certain governmental entity projects) to consider
 and take action on the following matters:
 (1)  Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter not included in either the house
 or senate version of the bill by adding, in SECTION 1 of the bill,
 the following:
 Sec. 2252.2025.  REPORT. (a) Not later than December 1,
 2018, the Texas Water Development Board shall electronically submit
 to the state auditor a report on all contracts for construction of a
 project that received financial assistance under Chapter 15, 16, or
 17, Water Code, during the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2017.
 The report must include:
 (1)  the impacts on a political subdivision that has
 obtained or applied for financial assistance from the board under
 Chapter 15, 16, or 17, Water Code; and
 (2)  for each project that has obtained financial
 assistance as described by this subsection:
 (A)  the country of origin of the iron and steel
 products used in the project, in accordance with 19 U.S.C. Section
 1304;
 (B)  the cost and quantity of all iron and steel
 products received from each country of origin for the project; and
 (C)  any related bond information, including the
 credit rating of general obligation bonds or revenue bonds issued
 by the board to finance or refinance projects included in the state
 water plan and the potential impact to that credit rating as a
 result of the bond issuance by the board.
 (b)  The state auditor shall prepare a summary on the report
 submitted under Subsection (a) and electronically submit the
 summary to the legislature not later than January 1, 2019.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 Explanation: The change is necessary to require the Texas
 Water Development Board to electronically submit to the state
 auditor a report on all contracts for construction of projects that
 received financial assistance from the board under Chapter 15, 16,
 or 17, Water Code, during the state fiscal year ending August 31,
 2017, and to require the state auditor to submit to the legislature
 a summary of that report.
 (2)  Senate Rule 12.03(1) is suspended to permit the
 committee to amend text not in disagreement in proposed SECTION
 6(b) of the bill, in the transition provisions of the bill, to read
 as follows:
 (b)  Subchapter F, Chapter 2252, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, does not apply to a project as described by Section 15.432
 or 15.472, Water Code, that the Texas Water Development Board has
 formally approved for financial assistance. In this subsection, the
 term "formally approved" means any project that is the subject of a
 resolution approving an application for financial assistance
 adopted by the Texas Water Development Board before May 1, 2019, for
 any portion of the financing of the project.
 Explanation: The change is necessary to extend the time
 before certain contracts are subject to Subchapter F, Chapter 2252,
 Government Code, as added by the Act, to allow the Texas Water
 Development Board to submit the report and the state auditor to
 submit the summary required by Section 2252.2025, Government Code,
 as added by the Act.