Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR918 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2017

                    By: Creighton S.R. No. 918


 SENATE RESOLUTION
 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, That Senate Rule 12.03 be
 suspended in part as provided by Senate Rule 12.08 to enable the
 conference committee appointed to resolve the differences on
 Senate Bill 1289 (the purchase of iron and steel products made in
 the United States for certain governmental entity projects) to
 consider and take action on the following matters:
 (1)  Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter not included in either the house
 or senate version of the bill by adding, in SECTION 1 of the bill,
 the following:
 Sec. 2252.2025.  REPORT. (a)  Not later than December 1,
 2018, the Texas Water Development Board shall electronically
 submit to the state auditor a report on all contracts for
 construction of a project that received financial assistance
 under Chapter 15, 16, or 17, Water Code, during the state fiscal
 year ending August 31, 2017. The report must include:
 (1)  the impacts on a political subdivision that has
 obtained or applied for financial assistance from the board under
 Chapter 15, 16, or 17, Water Code; and
 (2)  for each project that has obtained financial
 assistance as described by this subsection:
 (A)  the country of origin of the iron and steel
 products used in the project, in accordance with 19 U.S.C.
 Section 1304;
 (B)  the cost and quantity of all iron and steel
 products received from each country of origin for the project;
 and
 (C)  any related bond information, including
 the credit rating of general obligation bonds or revenue bonds
 issued by the board to finance or refinance projects included in
 the state water plan and the potential impact to that credit
 rating as a result of the bond issuance by the board.
 (b)  The state auditor shall prepare a summary on the
 report submitted under Subsection (a) and electronically submit
 the summary to the legislature not later than January 1, 2019.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 Explanation: The change is necessary to require the Texas
 Water Development Board to electronically submit to the state
 auditor a report on all contracts for construction of projects
 that received financial assistance from the board under Chapter
 15, 16, or 17, Water Code, during the state fiscal year ending
 August 31, 2017, and to require the state auditor to submit to the
 legislature a summary of that report.
 (2)  Senate Rule 12.03(1) is suspended to permit the
 committee to amend text not in disagreement in proposed SECTION
 6(b) of the bill, in the transition provisions of the bill, to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Subchapter F, Chapter 2252, Government Code, as added
 by this Act, does not apply to a project as described by Section
 15.432 or 15.472, Water Code, that the Texas Water Development
 Board has formally approved for financial assistance.  In this
 subsection, the term "formally approved" means any project that
 is the subject of a resolution approving an application for
 financial assistance adopted by the Texas Water Development
 Board before May 1, 2019, for any portion of the financing of the
 project.
 Explanation:  The change is necessary to extend the time
 before certain contracts are subject to Subchapter F, Chapter
 2252, Government Code, as added by the Act, to allow the Texas
 Water Development Board to submit the report and the state
 auditor to submit the summary required by Section 2252.2025,
 Government Code, as added by the Act.
  _______________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays 3.
  _______________________________
  Secretary of the Senate