Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate 2017 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR135

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Matagorda County Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR136

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Panola County Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR137

Celebrating February 6 through 10, 2017, as School Counseling Week.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR138

Recognizing February 28, 2017, as Leadership Jacksonville Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR139

Proclaiming February 6, 2017, as 9-1-1 Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR14

Recognizing Taft Independent School District on the occasion of its 95th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR140

Proclaiming February 6, 2017, as Texas Adoptee Rights Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR141

Recognizing February 8, 2017, as Mental Illness Awareness Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR142

Recognizing February 15, 2017, as Best Southwest Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR143

Recognizing Feeding Texas for its work on behalf of low-income families.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR144

Recognizing Johnny Anderson for his contributions to the Texas cotton industry.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR145

Recognizing February 8, 2017, as Communities In Schools Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR146

Recognizing this year's participants in the Bob Bullock Scholars Program of Baylor University.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR147

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Blue and White Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR148

Recognizing F. B. "Lico" Reyes for his work as an advocate for civil rights and labor rights.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records