Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate 2017 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR19

Recognizing Lou and Jim "Corky" Dawson on the occasion of their 50th wedding anniversary.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR190

Commending Anthony Louis Fazzino for achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR191

Recognizing the Texas Center for the Book and the Texas State Library and Archives Commission for launching the Read Across Texas program.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR192

Recognizing February 14, 2017, as Bee County Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR193

Recognizing February 15, 2017, as Orange and Maroon Legislative Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR194

Recognizing February 15, 2017, as San Patricio County Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR195

Recognizing February 14, 2017, as Rita L. Littlefield Kidney Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR196

Recognizing Gloria Dean Randle Scott for her contributions to her community.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR197

Recognizing February 21, 2017, as Texas A&M University--Corpus Christi Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR198

Recognizing February 16, 2017, as Rowlett Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR199

Recognizing February 15, 2017, as Garland Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR2

Recognizing February 22 and 23, 2017, as El Paso Days.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR20

Recognizing January 24, 2017, as Texas Southern University Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR200

Recognizing Tomasita Lyle on the occasion of her retirement.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR201

Recognizing February 22, 2017, as Lubbock Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records