Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate 2017 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR270

Recognizing Libby Averyt on the occasion of her retirement.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR271

Recognizing Charles Smith on the occasion of his retirement.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR272

Recognizing March 1, 2017, as the Day of the Fallen.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR273

In memory of Richard Moya.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR274

Recognizing February 22, 2017, as Liquefied Natural Gas Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR275

Recognizing Alyce Roberta Gay Goff for her 75 years of service to the Dallas Alumnae Chapter of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Incorporated.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR276

Recognizing the Texas Alliance of Boys and Girls Clubs for its contributions to young Texans.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR277

Celebrating February 28, 2017, as Prairie View A&M University Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR278

Recognizing February 28, 2017, as Wharton County Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR279

Recognizing February 27, 2017, as Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR28

In memory of Billy R. Bradford Sr.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR280

Recognizing March 7, 2017, as Van Zandt County Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR281

Recognizing February 26 through 28, 2017, as Rockwall County Days.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR282

Recognizing Eugene Adrian Van Zelfden Jr. for his contributions to this state.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR283

Recognizing Jerry Jones on the occasion of his induction into the Pro Football Hall of Fame.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records