Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate 2017 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR405

Recognizing Theodore Roosevelt IV for his commitment to conservation.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR406

Recognizing the Clark Middle School band for receiving the 2016 Sudler Cup.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR407

Declaring May 3, 2017, as Moonlight Tower Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR408

Recognizing March 13, 2017, as Girl Scout Legislative Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR409

In memory of Weston Gray Frost.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR41

In memory of Lynda Arnold.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR410

Congratulating Caroline Morgan and Marshall Maher on the birth of their daughter, Penelope Zara Morgan-Maher.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR411

In memory of Donald Blair Lang Jr.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR412

Celebrating March 16, 2017, as Absolutely Incredible Kid Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR413

Recognizing Fidel Jasso on the occasion of his retirement.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR414

Proclaiming March 16, 2017, Williamson County Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR415

Recognizing May 3, 2017, as County Government Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR416

Recognizing October 13, 2017, as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR417

Recognizing March 23, 2017, as Community Impact Newspaper Day.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR418

In memory of the life of Robert Russell Barnett.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records