Texas 2017 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB9 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 07/28/2017

                    85S11757 DMS-D
 By: Burkett, Davis of Harris, Morrison, H.B. No. 9
 Klick, et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 9:
 By:  Price C.S.H.B. No. 9


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to maternal health and safety, pregnancy-related deaths,
 and maternal morbidity, including postpartum depression.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 34.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.005.  DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall:
 (1)  study and review:
 (A)  cases of pregnancy-related deaths; [and]
 (B)  trends, rates, or disparities in
 pregnancy-related deaths and [in] severe maternal morbidity;
 (C)  health conditions and factors that
 disproportionately affect the most at-risk population as
 determined in the joint biennial report required under Section
 34.015; and
 (D)  best practices and programs operating in
 other states that have reduced rates of pregnancy-related deaths;
 (2)  compare rates of pregnancy-related deaths based on
 the socioeconomic status of the mother;
 (3)  determine the feasibility of the task force
 studying cases of severe maternal morbidity; and
 (4)  in consultation with the Perinatal Advisory
 Council, [(3)] make recommendations to help reduce the incidence of
 pregnancy-related deaths and severe maternal morbidity in this
 state.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 34, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Section 34.0055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.0055.  SCREENING AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS FOR
 SUBSTANCE USE. (a) The task force, in coordination with the
 department, shall:
 (1)  make available to physicians and other persons
 licensed or certified to conduct a substance use screening of
 pregnant women information that includes:
 (A)  guidance regarding best practices for
 verbally screening a pregnant woman for substance use using a
 validated screening tool; and
 (B)  a list of substance use treatment resources
 in each geographic region of this state; and
 (2)  review and promote the use of educational
 materials on the consequences of opioid drug use during pregnancy.
 (b)  The department shall make available on the department's
 Internet website the information and educational materials
 described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  Sections 34.007(a) and (b), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall determine a statistically
 significant number of cases of pregnancy-related deaths for review.
 The department shall either randomly select cases or select all
 cases for the task force to review under this subsection to reflect
 a cross-section of pregnancy-related deaths in this state.
 (b)  The department shall statistically analyze aggregate
 data of pregnancy-related deaths and severe maternal morbidity in
 this state to identify any trends, rates, or disparities.
 SECTION 4.  Section 34.015(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The report must include the task force's
 recommendations under Section 34.005(4) [34.005(3)].
 SECTION 5.  Chapter 34, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Sections 34.0155, 34.0156, and 34.0157 to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.0155.  REPORT ON PREGNANCY-RELATED DEATHS, SEVERE
 MATERNAL MORBIDITY, AND POSTPARTUM DEPRESSION. The commission
 shall:
 (1)  evaluate options for reducing pregnancy-related
 deaths, focusing on the most prevalent causes of pregnancy-related
 deaths as identified in the joint biennial report required under
 Section 34.015, and for treating postpartum depression in
 economically disadvantaged women;
 (2)  in coordination with the department and the task
 force, identify strategies to:
 (A)  lower costs of providing medical assistance
 under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, related to severe maternal
 morbidity and chronic illness; and
 (B)  improve quality outcomes related to the
 underlying causes of severe maternal morbidity and chronic illness;
 and
 (3)  not later than December 1 of each even-numbered
 year, submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker
 of the house of representatives, the Legislative Budget Board, and
 the appropriate standing committees of the legislature a written
 report that includes:
 (A)  a summary of the commission's and
 department's efforts to accomplish the tasks described by
 Subdivisions (1) and (2); and
 (B)  a summary of the report required by Section
 34.0156.
 Sec. 34.0156.  MATERNAL HEALTH AND SAFETY INITIATIVE. (a)
 Using existing resources, the department, in collaboration with the
 task force, shall promote and facilitate the use among health care
 providers in this state of maternal health and safety informational
 materials, including tools and procedures related to best practices
 in maternal health and safety.
 (b)  Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the department shall submit a report to the executive commissioner
 that includes:
 (1)  a summary of the initiative's implementation and
 outcomes; and
 (2)  recommendations for improving the effectiveness
 of the initiative.
 Sec. 34.0157.  FEASIBILITY STUDY RELATED TO MATERNAL HEALTH
 AND SAFETY INITIATIVE. (a)  Using existing resources and not later
 than December 1, 2018, the commission shall study and determine the
 feasibility of adding a provider's use of procedures included in
 the maternal health and safety initiative described by Section
 34.0156 as an indicator of quality for commission data and medical
 assistance quality-based payment purposes.
 (b)  The department shall collaborate with the commission in
 compiling available data and information needed to complete the
 feasibility study.
 (c)  The commission shall include the commission's
 determination from the feasibility study in the report required by
 Section 34.0155.
 (d)  This section expires May 1, 2019.
 SECTION 6.  Section 34.018, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.018.  SUNSET PROVISION. The task force is subject to
 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued
 in existence as provided by that chapter, the task force is
 abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023 [2019].
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.0712 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.0712.  CAUSE OF DEATH DATA IMPROVEMENT. (a) Not
 later than December 1 of each even-numbered year, the department
 shall submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the
 house of representatives, and appropriate standing committees of
 the legislature a report on the processes and procedures for
 collecting cause of death information, including any challenges to
 collecting accurate information relating to maternal mortality.
 (b)  In preparing the report, the department may examine:
 (1)  issues relating to the quality of the death
 information being collected, including the accuracy and
 completeness of the information;
 (2)  the role of medical certifiers in death
 information collection;
 (3)  the perceptions of the individuals collecting the
 death information regarding the information's integrity;
 (4)  the training required for the individuals
 collecting death information; and
 (5)  the structural, procedural, and technological
 issues of collecting the information.
 (c)  The department, in consultation with the Maternal
 Mortality and Morbidity Task Force, shall examine national
 standards regarding the collection of death information and may
 convene a panel of experts to advise the department and the task
 force in developing recommendations for improving the collection of
 accurate information related to cause of death.
 (d)  The report may be included as part of another report the
 department is required to submit to the legislature.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 8.  Not later than June 1, 2018, the Maternal
 Mortality and Morbidity Task Force, in coordination with the
 Department of State Health Services, shall make available the
 information and educational materials described by Section
 34.0055, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 9.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that an additional waiver or additional
 authorization from a federal agency is necessary for implementation
 of that provision, the agency affected by the provision shall
 request the waiver or authorization and may delay implementing that
 provision until the waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of
 the legislative session.