Texas 2017 85th 1st C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB102 Introduced / Bill

Filed 07/24/2017

                    85S11045 KLA-F
 By: Menéndez S.B. No. 102


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reimbursement rates for Medicaid acute care therapy
 services; making an appropriation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In addition to other amounts appropriated to
 the Health and Human Services Commission for the state fiscal
 biennium ending August 31, 2019, $112,020,886 is appropriated from
 the economic stabilization fund and $148,492,803 is appropriated
 from federal funds to the Health and Human Services Commission for
 that state fiscal biennium to:
 (1)  fully reverse the reductions made during the state
 fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2017, to reimbursement rates for
 Medicaid acute care therapy services that are not reversed in
 accordance with Rider 218, S.B. 1, Acts of the 85th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2017 (the General Appropriations Act), to the bill
 pattern of the appropriations to the commission; and
 (2)  provide funding to make unnecessary the
 implementation during the state fiscal biennium ending August 31,
 2019, of adopted reductions in reimbursement rates paid to therapy
 assistants for the provision of Medicaid acute care therapy
 services.
 (b)  It is the intent of the legislature that the Health and
 Human Services Commission ensure that money appropriated by this
 section is fully reflected in the reimbursement rates paid to
 providers of Medicaid acute care therapy services in both the
 Medicaid fee-for-service and managed care delivery models.
 SECTION 2.  Rider 218, S.B. 1, Acts of the 85th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2017 (the General Appropriations Act), to the bill
 pattern of the appropriations to the Health and Human Services
 Commission is amended to read as follows:
 218. Adjustment of Therapy Rate Reductions. Funds
 appropriated above in the strategies in Goal A, Medicaid Client
 Services, include $11,850,000 in General Revenue Funds and
 $15,593,261 in Federal Funds ($27,443,261 in All Funds) for fiscal
 year 2018 and $12,555,500 in General Revenue Funds and $16,834,045
 in Federal Funds ($29,389,045 in All Funds) for fiscal year 2019 to
 restore approximately 25 percent of the reductions made to
 reimbursement rates for acute care therapy services during the
 2016-17 biennium. The Health and Human Services Commission is
 directed to allocate the restorations among provider types and
 procedure codes to preserve access to care for clients served under
 Medicaid fee-for-service and managed care models. It is the intent
 of the Legislature that HHSC shall ensure any funds restored
 through this rider are fully reflected in reimbursement rates paid
 to providers of acute care therapy services in both fee-for-service
 and managed care models.
 Additionally, funds appropriated above in Goal A, Medicaid
 Client Services, include $14,100,000 in General Revenue Funds and
 $18,554,006 in Federal Funds ($32,654,006 in All Funds) for fiscal
 year 2018 for the payment of reimbursements to [phase-in and delay
 the reduction of rates for] therapy assistants for the provision of
 Medicaid acute care therapy services. [Appropriated amounts assume
 the reductions will not begin until December 1, 2017 and that rates
 will remain at 85 percent of the rate paid to a licensed therapist
 from that date until September 1, 2018. Appropriated amounts assume
 rates for therapy assistants will be reduced to 70 percent of the
 rate paid to a licensed therapist beginning September 1, 2018.]
 SECTION 3.  (a) Subject to Subsection (b) of this section:
 (1)  this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a
 vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution; and
 (2)  if this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect on the 91st day after the
 last day of the legislative session.
 (b)  This Act takes effect only if it receives a vote of
 two-thirds of the members present in each house of the legislature,
 as provided by Section 49-g(m), Article III, Texas Constitution.