Texas 2017 85th 1st C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB14 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 07/24/2017

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 14
 (In the Senate - Filed July 10, 2017; July 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 July 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3; July 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 14 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a property owner's right to remove a tree or vegetation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 240.909(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 250.009, the [The]
 commissioners court of a county subject to this section may
 prohibit or restrict the clear-cutting of live oak trees in the
 unincorporated area of the county.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Chapter 250, Local Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 250.  MISCELLANEOUS LOCAL GOVERNMENT REGULATORY AUTHORITY
 [OF MUNICIPALITIES AND COUNTIES]
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 250, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 250.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 250.009.  REMOVAL OF TREE OR VEGETATION.  (a)  Except
 as provided by Subsection (b) and Section 240.909, a municipality,
 county, or other political subdivision may not enact or enforce any
 ordinance, rule, or other regulation that restricts the ability of
 a property owner of residential real property to remove a tree or
 vegetation on the owner's property, including a regulation that
 requires the owner to file an affidavit or notice before removing
 the tree or vegetation.
 (b)  This section does not prevent the enforcement of:
 (1)  a provision in a dedicatory instrument, as defined
 by Section 202.001, Property Code, that restricts the ability of a
 property owner to remove a tree or vegetation on the owner's
 property, including a bylaw, rule, or regulation of a political
 subdivision enforcing a provision of a dedicatory instrument that
 requires the owner to file an affidavit or notice before removing
 the tree or vegetation; or
 (2)  an ordinance, rule, or other regulation designed
 to mitigate tree-borne diseases as recommended by the Texas A&M
 Forest Service.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect December 1, 2017.
 * * * * *