Texas 2017 85th 1st C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR11 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/18/2017

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 11
 In Memory
 of
 Jimmie Clayton Harrison
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Jimmie
 Clayton Harrison of Bryans Mill, who passed away on May 17, 2017,
 at the age of 61; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Jimmie and Thelma Harrison, "Clay"
 Harrison was born on October 29, 1955, in Naples, Texas; he
 earned his bachelor's degree at East Texas State University and
 later graduated from the Southwestern Graduate School of Banking
 at Southern Methodist University; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed Texan enjoyed a successful career
 in the banking industry; he was associated with Morris County
 National Bank in Naples for 38 years, including 15 years as its
 president, and he was employed at American National Bank of
 Mount Pleasant at the time of his passing; he was also a lifelong
 rancher; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Harrison gave back to his community through
 his service as president of the Paul Pewitt School Board and his
 involvement with the Naples-Omaha Lions Club and the
 Naples-Omaha Ambulance Association; a man of strong faith, he
 attended Daniels Chapel Congregational Methodist Church in Naples
 and taught Sunday school; in his spare time, he enjoyed taking
 part in such outdoor activities as camping and fishing; and
 WHEREAS, On June 17, 1978, Mr. Harrison married the former
 Barbara Gunter, and the couple enjoyed a rewarding union that
 spanned38years;theywereblessedwiththreechildren,
 Miranda, Holly, and Clifton, and four grandchildren, Calli,
 Natalie, Tenley, and Taylor; and
 WHEREAS, Clay Harrison led a caring and purposeful life,
 and all those who shared in his love and affection will forever
 hold him close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Jimmie Clayton Harrison and extend heartfelt sympathy to his
 family and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of Clay Harrison.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on July 18, 2017, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate