Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1025 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2019

                    By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1025
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1025 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to membership on and the eligibility of certain persons to
 serve on the board of certain property owners' associations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 209.00591, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-2) and (a-3) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter,
 a property owners' association that governs a subdivision comprised
 of multiple sections may designate in an association instrument
 governing the administration or operation of the association a
 specified number of positions on the board, each of which must be
 elected from a designated section of the subdivision. The
 instrument may require each board member representing a section to
 reside in that section.
 (a-3)  A person may not serve on the board of a property
 owners' association if the person cohabits at the same primary
 residence with another board member of the association.  This
 subsection does not apply:
 (1)  to an association with fewer than 10 residences;
 or
 (2)  during a subdivision's development period to
 affect the eligibility to serve on the board of:
 (A)  a person who cohabits with a developer of the
 subdivision regulated by the association; or
 (B)  the developer.
 SECTION 2.  Section 209.00591(a-3), Property Code, as added
 by this Act:
 (1)  does not affect the entitlement of a member
 serving on the board of a property owners' association immediately
 before the effective date of this Act to continue to carry out the
 board's functions for the remainder of the member's term; and
 (2)  applies only to a member elected on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 (b)  Section 209.00591(a-3), Property Code, as added by this
 Act, takes effect immediately if this Act receives a vote of
 two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by
 Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not
 receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, Section
 209.00591(a-3), Property Code, as added by this Act, takes effect
 September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *