Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1026 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Bohac, Allison (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1026
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1026 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to instruction in positive character traits in public
 schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 29.906, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.906.  CHARACTER TRAITS INSTRUCTION [EDUCATION
 PROGRAM].
 SECTION 2.  Section 29.906, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (g) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The State Board of Education shall integrate positive
 character traits into the essential knowledge and skills adopted
 for kindergarten through grade 12, as appropriate [A school
 district may provide a character education program].
 (b)  The State Board of Education must include the following
 [A character education program under this section must:
 [(1)  stress] positive character traits [, such as]:
 (1) [(A)]  courage;
 (2) [(B)]  trustworthiness, including honesty,
 reliability, punctuality, and loyalty;
 (3) [(C)]  integrity;
 (4) [(D)]  respect and courtesy;
 (5) [(E)]  responsibility, including accountability,
 diligence, perseverance, and self-control;
 (6) [(F)]  fairness, including justice and freedom
 from prejudice;
 (7) [(G)]  caring, including kindness, empathy,
 compassion, consideration, patience, generosity, and charity;
 (8) [(H)]  good citizenship, including patriotism,
 concern for the common good and the community, and respect for
 authority and the law; [and]
 (9) [(I)]  school pride; and
 (10)  gratitude[;
 [(2)  use integrated teaching strategies; and
 [(3)  be age appropriate].
 (c)  Each school district and open-enrollment charter school
 must adopt a character education program that includes the positive
 character traits listed in Subsection (b).  In developing or
 selecting a character education program under this section, a
 school district shall consult with a committee selected by the
 district that consists of:
 (1)  parents of district students;
 (2)  educators; and
 (3)  other members of the community, including
 community leaders.
 (g)  The State Board of Education may adopt rules as
 necessary to implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *