Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1028 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Guillen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1028
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1028 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the criminal penalties for certain offenses
 committed in a disaster area or an evacuated area.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 12.50(b) and (c), Penal Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The increase in punishment authorized by this section
 applies only to an offense under:
 (1)  Section 22.01;
 (2)  Section 28.02;
 (3)  Section 29.02;
 (4) [(3)]  Section 30.02;
 (5)  Section 30.03;
 (6)  Section 30.04;
 (7)  Section 30.05; and
 (8) [(4)]  Section 31.03.
 (c)  If an offense listed under Subsection (b)(1), (5), (6),
 (7), or (8) [(4)] is punishable as a Class A misdemeanor, the
 minimum term of confinement for the offense is increased to 180
 days. If an offense listed under Subsection (b)(2), [(b)(3) or]
 (4), or (8) is punishable as a felony of the first degree, the
 punishment for that offense may not be increased under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.50(d), Penal Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *