Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1039 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2019

                    By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1039
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of U.S. Highway 59 in Garrison as the
 Constable Darrell Lunsford Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.152.  CONSTABLE DARRELL LUNSFORD MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a) The portion of U.S. Highway 59 in Garrison is designated as the
 Constable Darrell Lunsford Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Constable Darrell Lunsford Memorial Highway and
 any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *