Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1045 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/24/2019

                    86R4461 SRA-D
 By: Neave H.B. No. 1045


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a women veterans suicide tracking system and required
 reporting of women veteran suicides by certain persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.217 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.217.  WOMEN VETERANS SUICIDE TRACKING SYSTEM;
 REQUIRED REPORTING OF CERTAIN SUICIDES. (a)  The program, in
 collaboration with the United States Department of Veterans
 Affairs, shall develop and maintain a system for tracking the
 number of suicides of women veterans in this state and determining
 the number of those women veterans who received services from the
 United States Department of Veterans Affairs.  The tracking system
 must include data:
 (1)  available from the United States Department of
 Veterans Affairs; and
 (2)  reported to the program under Subsection (b).
 (b)  A person who knows that the cause of death for a woman
 veteran is suicide shall report the suicide to the program and
 provide any information the person may have that may assist the
 program in determining whether the woman received services from the
 United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
 (c)  The following persons shall provide to the program in
 accordance with Subsection (b) any relevant information the person
 obtains related to the suicide death of a woman veteran:
 (1)  a medical examiner or a justice of the peace who is
 acting as a coroner;
 (2)  a health care facility licensed under Subtitle B,
 Title 4, Health and Safety Code; or
 (3)  a mental health facility as defined by Section
 571.003, Health and Safety Code.
 (d)  Information about the suicide of a woman veteran
 obtained under this chapter is confidential and is not subject to
 disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code, is not subject to
 subpoena, and may not otherwise be released or made public.
 (e)  Not later than December 31 of each year, the program
 shall submit to the legislature a report that includes:
 (1)  the number of suicides of women veterans that were
 reported to the program under this section during the preceding
 year;
 (2)  the number of women described by Subdivision (1)
 who received services from the United States Department of Veterans
 Affairs;
 (3)  information on whether the suicide rate of women
 veterans in this state is decreasing or increasing;
 (4)  an evaluation of the effectiveness of statewide
 prevention and awareness campaigns in decreasing the number of
 suicides by women veterans in this state; and
 (5)  recommendations for improving the effectiveness
 of statewide prevention and awareness campaigns.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 31, 2019, the Texas Women
 Veterans Program shall develop the tracking system required by
 Section 434.217, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 434.217, Government
 Code, as added by this Act:
 (1)  a person is not required to comply with Section
 434.217(c) until January 1, 2020; and
 (2)  the Texas Women Veterans Program is not required
 to submit a report required by Section 434.217(e) to the
 legislature until December 31, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.