Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB105 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2019

                    By: Minjarez (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 105
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of information about oversize and
 overweight vehicles in the curriculum of driver education and
 driving safety courses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1001.1092 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.1092.  INFORMATION RELATING TO OVERSIZE AND
 OVERWEIGHT VEHICLES. The commission by rule shall require that
 information relating to methods of safely operating a motor vehicle
 near an oversize or overweight vehicle, including safe following
 distances and safe passing methods, be included in the curriculum
 of each driver education course and driving safety course.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than March 1, 2020, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules
 required by Section 1001.1092, Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2020, each provider of a
 driver education course or driving safety course shall submit the
 curriculum adopted pursuant to Section 1001.1092, Education Code,
 as added by this Act, to the Texas Commission of Licensing and
 Regulation for approval.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *