Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1060 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Bell of Montgomery, et al. H.B. No. 1060
 (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Property Tax; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a property owner to request that notice
 of a protest hearing before the appraisal review board be delivered
 by certified mail or electronic mail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.085, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (m)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, a
 property owner need not enter into an agreement under this section
 to be entitled to electronic delivery of a notice of a protest
 hearing under Section 41.46.
 SECTION 2.  Section 41.46, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  The appraisal review board shall deliver notice of the
 hearing by certified mail if, in the notice of protest under Section
 41.44, the property owner requests delivery by certified mail.  The
 board may require the property owner to pay the cost of postage
 under this subsection.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Section 1.085, the appraisal review
 board shall deliver notice of the hearing by electronic mail if, in
 the notice of protest under Section 41.44, the property owner
 requests delivery by electronic mail and provides a valid
 electronic mail address.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *