Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1064 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1064
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating May 4 as Texas Firefighters Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.071.  TEXAS FIREFIGHTERS DAY. (a) May 4 is Texas
 Firefighters Day in honor of the bravery, determination, and
 service of Texas firefighters, many of whom are volunteers.
 (b)  Texas Firefighters Day may be regularly observed by
 appropriate ceremonies and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *