Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1140 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1140
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fees for vehicles stored at vehicle storage facilities;
 authorizing fee increases and decreases; eliminating a fee;
 eliminating a minimum fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2303.155(a) and (b), Occupations Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For the purposes of this section, "governmental vehicle
 storage facility" means a garage, parking lot, or other facility
 that is:
 (1) [(A)]  owned by a governmental entity; and
 (2) [(B)]  used to store or park at least 10 vehicles
 each year.
 (b)  The operator of a vehicle storage facility or
 governmental vehicle storage facility may charge the owner of a
 vehicle stored or parked at the facility:
 (1)  a notification fee set in a reasonable amount for
 providing notice under this subchapter, including notice under
 Section 2303.154(c);
 (2)  an impoundment fee of $20, subject to Section
 2303.1552, for any action that:
 (A)  is taken by or at the direction of the owner
 or operator of the facility; and
 (B)  is necessary to preserve, protect, or service
 a vehicle stored or parked at the facility;
 (3)  a daily storage fee, subject to Section 2303.1552,
 of:
 (A)  [not less than $5 and not more than] $20 for
 each day or part of a day the vehicle is stored at the facility if
 the vehicle is not longer than 25 feet; or
 (B)  $35 for each day or part of a day the vehicle
 is stored at the facility if the vehicle is longer than 25 feet; and
 (4)  any fee that is required to be submitted to a law
 enforcement agency, the agency's authorized agent, or a
 governmental entity [; and
 [(5)     a fee in an amount set by the commission for the
 remediation, recovery, or capture of an environmental or biological
 hazard].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 2303, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2303.1552 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2303.1552.  BIENNIAL ADJUSTMENT OF CERTAIN FEES. (a)
 In this section, "consumer price index" means the Consumer Price
 Index for All Urban Consumers (CPI-U) published by the Bureau of
 Labor Statistics of the United States Department of Labor.
 (b)  On January 1 of each even-numbered year, the impoundment
 fee under Section 2303.155(b)(2) and the storage fees under Section
 2303.155(b)(3) are increased or decreased by an amount equal to the
 amount of the applicable fee in effect on December 31 of the
 preceding year multiplied by the percentage increase or decrease in
 the consumer price index during the preceding state fiscal
 biennium.
 (c)  Not later than November 1 of each odd-numbered year, the
 commission shall:
 (1)  adjust the fees in accordance with Subsection (b);
 and
 (2)  publish the adjusted fees on the department's
 Internet website.
 (d)  If a fee is decreased under this section, the operator
 of a vehicle storage facility or governmental vehicle storage
 facility, as defined by Section 2303.155, shall begin charging the
 adjusted fee on the effective date of the decrease. If a fee is
 increased under this section, the operator may begin charging the
 adjusted fee at any time on or after the effective date of the
 increase.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *