Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1168 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Anchia, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 1168
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 3; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the offense of possessing a weapon in a secured area of
 an airport.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 46.03(c)(3), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (3)  "Secured area" means an area:
 (A)  of an airport terminal building or of an
 adjacent aircraft parking area used by common carriers in air
 transportation but not used by general aviation; and
 (B)  to which access is controlled [by the
 inspection of persons and property] under federal law.
 SECTION 2.  Section 46.03(e), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (e)  It is a defense to prosecution under Subsection (a)(5)
 that the actor:
 (1)  checked all firearms as baggage in accordance with
 federal or state law or regulations before entering a secured area;
 or
 (2)  was authorized by a federal agency or the airport
 operator to possess a firearm in a secured area.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *