Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1174 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Reynolds, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1174
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019;
 May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 20, 2019, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1174 By:  Alvarado


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain county assistance districts to
 provide a grant or loan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 387.006(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A district may:
 (1)  perform any act necessary to the full exercise of
 the district's functions;
 (2)  accept a grant or loan from:
 (A)  the United States;
 (B)  an agency or political subdivision of this
 state; or
 (C)  a public or private person;
 (3)  acquire, sell, lease, convey, or otherwise dispose
 of property or an interest in property under terms determined by the
 district;
 (4)  employ necessary personnel;
 (5)  adopt rules to govern the operation of the
 district and its employees and property; [and]
 (6)  enter into agreements with municipalities
 necessary or convenient to achieve the district's purposes,
 including agreements regarding the duration, rate, and allocation
 between the district and the municipality of sales and use taxes;
 and
 (7)  if the district is created by a county with a
 population of more than 580,000 that borders a county with a
 population of more than four million, provide a grant or loan to a
 political subdivision to assist in funding the performance of one
 or more functions a district is authorized to perform under this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *