Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1177 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: Phelan, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1177
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1177 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to carrying a concealed handgun following a mandatory
 evacuation order issued during a state of disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 46.15, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (k) and (l) to read as follows:
 (k)  Section 46.02 does not apply to a person who carries a
 handgun if:
 (1)  the person carries the handgun in a concealed
 manner;
 (2)  the person carries the handgun while:
 (A)  evacuating from an area following a mandatory
 evacuation order issued during a state of disaster declared under
 Section 418.014, Government Code, or a local state of disaster
 declared under Section 418.108, Government Code, with respect to
 that area; or
 (B)  reentering that area following the person's
 evacuation;
 (3)  not more than 48 hours have elapsed since the
 mandatory evacuation order was issued, or more than 48 hours have
 elapsed since the mandatory evacuation order was issued and the
 governor has extended the period during which a person may carry a
 concealed handgun; and
 (4)  the person is not prohibited by state or federal
 law from possessing a firearm.
 (l)  For purposes of Subsection (k), "evacuating" means the
 immediate and urgent movement of a person away from an area that is
 subject to an evacuation order.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense was
 committed before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *