Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1215 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2019

                    By: Collier, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 1215
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
 May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2019, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1215 By:  Alvarado


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation of low income housing tax credits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.67022, Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.67022.  QUALIFIED ALLOCATION PLAN; MANUAL. (a)
 At least biennially, the board shall adopt a qualified allocation
 plan and a corresponding manual to provide information regarding
 the administration of and eligibility for the low income housing
 tax credit program.  The board may adopt the plan and manual
 annually, as considered appropriate by the board.
 (b)  The department may require as part of the threshold
 criteria under a qualified allocation plan that a proposed
 development satisfy certain criteria relating to educational
 quality, as specified by the department in that plan.
 (c)  The department may not adopt a qualified allocation plan
 that uses a scoring system that awards points to an application
 based on criteria relating to the educational quality applicable to
 a proposed development site.
 (d)  This subsection and Subsections (b) and (c) expire
 September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Texas Department of Housing and
 Community Affairs shall conduct a study of the effects that the
 implementation of Sections 2306.67022(b) and (c), Government Code,
 as added by this Act, has on the allocation of low income housing
 tax credits in this state.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2021, the Texas Department of
 Housing and Community Affairs shall submit to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and each standing committee of the legislature with jurisdiction
 over affordable housing a report regarding the study required by
 Subsection (a) of this section.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for low income housing tax credits that is
 submitted to the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs
 during an application cycle that is based on the 2020 qualified
 allocation plan or a subsequent plan adopted by the governing board
 of the department under Section 2306.67022, Government Code, as
 amended by this Act. An application that is submitted during an
 application cycle that is based on an earlier qualified allocation
 plan is governed by the law in effect on the date the application
 cycle began, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *