Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1241 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: Bucy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 1241
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2019;
 April 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the content of a polling place location notice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Section 1.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1.021.  NOTICE OF POLLING PLACE LOCATION. When this
 code requires notice of a polling place location, the written
 notice must state the building name, if any, and the street address,
 including the suite or room number, if any, of the polling place.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *