H.B. No. 1262 AN ACT relating to the extended registration of certain vehicles not subject to inspection. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 502.0024 to read as follows: Sec. 502.0024. EXTENDED REGISTRATION OF CERTAIN VEHICLES NOT SUBJECT TO INSPECTION. (a) Notwithstanding Section 502.044(c), the department shall develop and implement a system of registration to allow an owner of a vehicle described by Section 548.052(3) other than a mobile home to register the vehicle for an extended registration period of not more than five years. The owner may select the number of years for registration under this section within that range and register the vehicle for that period. Payment for all applicable fees, including any optional fee imposed under Subchapter H and other registration fees and the fee required by Section 548.510, for the entire registration period selected is due at the time of registration. (b) The fee required by Section 548.510 shall be remitted to the comptroller for deposit in the Texas mobility fund, the general revenue fund, and the clean air account in amounts proportionate to the allocation prescribed by Subsection (b) of that section. (c) The fees imposed under Subchapter H shall be collected and remitted as prescribed by that subchapter. SECTION 2. Not later than February 1, 2020, the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles shall adopt the system required by Section 502.0024, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, and any rules necessary to implement that section. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1262 was passed by the House on April 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 1, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1262 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1262 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor