Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1313 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: King of Parker (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1313
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Property
 Tax; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas
 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the chief appraiser of an appraisal
 district to increase the appraised value of property in the tax year
 following the year in which the appraised value of the property is
 lowered as a result of a protest or appeal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.01(e), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding any provision of this subchapter to the
 contrary, if the appraised value of property in a tax year is
 lowered under Subtitle F, the appraised value of the property as
 finally determined under that subtitle is considered to be the
 appraised value of the property for that tax year.  In the next
 [following] tax year in which the property is appraised, the chief
 appraiser may not increase the appraised value of the property
 unless the increase by the chief appraiser is reasonably supported
 by clear and convincing [substantial] evidence when all of the
 reliable and probative evidence in the record is considered as a
 whole. If the appraised value is finally determined in a protest
 under Section 41.41(a)(2) or an appeal under Section 42.26, the
 chief appraiser may satisfy the requirement to reasonably support
 by clear and convincing [substantial] evidence an increase in the
 appraised value of the property in the next [following] tax year in
 which the property is appraised by presenting evidence showing that
 the inequality in the appraisal of property has been corrected with
 regard to the properties that were considered in determining the
 value of the subject property.  The burden of proof is on the chief
 appraiser to support an increase in the appraised value of property
 under the circumstances described by this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to the appraisal of
 property for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2020.
 * * * * *