Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1318 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Moody (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 1318
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1318 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of mental health services to persons
 younger than 18 years of age.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 2, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 35A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 35A. TEMPORARY AUTHORIZATION FOR INPATIENT MENTAL HEALTH
 SERVICES FOR MINOR CHILD
 Sec. 35A.001.  APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies to a
 person whose relationship to a child would make the person eligible
 to consent to treatment under Section 32.001(a)(1), (2), or (3),
 and who has had actual care, custody, and control of the child for
 the six months preceding the filing of a petition under this
 chapter.
 Sec. 35A.002.  TEMPORARY AUTHORIZATION. A person described
 by Section 35A.001 may seek a court order for temporary
 authorization to consent to voluntary inpatient mental health
 services for a child by filing a petition in the district court in
 the county in which the person resides.
 Sec. 35A.003.  PETITION FOR TEMPORARY AUTHORIZATION. A
 petition for temporary authorization to consent to voluntary
 inpatient mental health services for a child must:
 (1)  be styled "ex parte" and be in the name of the
 child;
 (2)  be verified by the petitioner;
 (3)  state:
 (A)  the name, date of birth, and current physical
 address of the child;
 (B)  the name, date of birth, and current physical
 address of the petitioner; and
 (C)  the name and, if known, the current physical
 and mailing addresses of the child's parents, conservators, or
 guardians;
 (4)  describe the status and location of any court
 proceeding in this or another state with respect to the child;
 (5)  describe the petitioner's relationship to the
 child;
 (6)  provide the dates during the preceding six months
 that the child has resided with the petitioner;
 (7)  contain a certificate of medical examination for
 mental illness prepared by a physician who has examined the child
 not earlier than the third day before the date the petition is filed
 and be accompanied by a sworn statement containing the physician's
 opinion, and the detailed reasons for that opinion, that the child
 is a person:
 (A)  with mental illness or who demonstrates
 symptoms of a serious emotional disorder; and
 (B)  who presents a risk of serious harm to self or
 others if not immediately restrained or hospitalized; and
 (8)  state any reason that the petitioner is unable to
 obtain signed, written documentation from a parent, conservator, or
 guardian of the child.
 Sec. 35A.004.  NOTICE; HEARING. (a) On receipt of the
 petition, the court shall set a hearing.
 (b)  A copy of the petition and notice of the hearing shall be
 delivered to the parent, conservator, or guardian of the child by
 personal service or by certified mail, return receipt requested, at
 the last known address of the parent, conservator, or guardian.
 Sec. 35A.005.  ORDER FOR TEMPORARY AUTHORIZATION. (a) At
 the hearing on the petition, the court may hear evidence relating to
 the child's need for inpatient mental health services by the
 petitioner, any other matter raised in the petition, and any
 objection or other testimony of the child's parent, conservator, or
 guardian.
 (b)  The court shall dismiss the petition for temporary
 authorization if an objection is made by the child's parent,
 conservator, or guardian.
 (c)  The court shall grant the petition for temporary
 authorization only if the court finds:
 (1)  by a preponderance of the evidence that the child
 does not have available a parent, conservator, guardian, or other
 legal representative to give consent under Section 572.001, Health
 and Safety Code, for voluntary inpatient mental health services;
 and
 (2)  by clear and convincing evidence that the child is
 a person:
 (A)  with mental illness or who demonstrates
 symptoms of a serious emotional disorder; and
 (B)  who presents a risk of serious harm to self or
 others if not immediately restrained or hospitalized.
 (d)  Subject to Subsection (e), the order granting temporary
 authorization under this chapter expires on the earliest of:
 (1)  the date the petitioner requests that the child be
 discharged from the inpatient mental health facility;
 (2)  the date a physician determines that the criteria
 listed in Subsection (c)(2) no longer apply to the child; or
 (3)  subject to Subsection (e), the 10th day after the
 date the order for temporary authorization is issued under this
 section.
 (e)  The order granting temporary authorization continues in
 effect until the earlier occurrence of an event described by
 Subsection (d)(1) or (2) if the petitioner obtains an order for
 temporary managing conservatorship before the order expires as
 provided by Subsection (d)(3).
 (f)  A copy of an order granting temporary authorization
 must:
 (1)  be filed under the cause number in any court that
 has rendered a conservatorship or guardian order regarding the
 child; and
 (2)  be sent to the last known address of the child's
 parent, conservator, or guardian.
 SECTION 2.  Section 572.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a), (a-1), and (c-1) and adding
 Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  A person 16 years of age or older may request admission
 to an inpatient mental health facility or for outpatient mental
 health services by filing a request with the administrator of the
 facility where admission or outpatient treatment is
 requested.  Subject to Subsection (c-1), the [The] parent,
 managing conservator, or guardian of a person younger than 18 years
 of age may request the admission of the person to an inpatient
 mental health facility or for outpatient mental health services by
 filing a request with the administrator of the facility where
 admission or outpatient treatment is requested.
 (a-1)  A person eligible to consent to treatment for the
 person under Section 32.001(a)(1), (2), or (3), Family Code, may
 request temporary authorization for the admission of the person to
 an inpatient mental health facility by petitioning under Chapter
 35A, Family Code, in the district court in the county in which the
 person resides for an order for temporary authorization to consent
 to voluntary mental health services under this section. The
 petitioner for temporary authorization may be represented by the
 county attorney or district attorney.
 (a-2)  Except as provided by Subsection (c-1) [(c)], an
 inpatient mental health facility may admit or provide services to a
 person 16 years of age or older and younger than 18 years of age if
 the person's parent, managing conservator, or guardian consents to
 the admission or services, even if the person does not consent to
 the admission or services.
 (c-1)  A person younger than 18 years of age may not be
 involuntarily committed unless provided by this chapter, Chapter
 55, Family Code, [other state law,] or department rule.
 SECTION 3.  Section 573.001(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A peace officer, without a warrant, may take a person
 into custody, regardless of the age of the person, if the officer:
 (1)  has reason to believe and does believe that:
 (A)  the person is a person with mental illness;
 and
 (B)  because of that mental illness there is a
 substantial risk of serious harm to the person or to others unless
 the person is immediately restrained; and
 (2)  believes that there is not sufficient time to
 obtain a warrant before taking the person into custody.
 SECTION 4.  Section 572.001(c), Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *