By: Wu, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1362 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019; May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1362 By: Perry A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the caseloads of child protective services caseworkers. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code, is amended by adding Section 40.05291 to read as follows: Sec. 40.05291. CASEWORKER CASELOAD SCORING SYSTEM AND REPORT. (a) The department shall study the development and implementation of a scoring system to ensure equity in the distribution of cases among child protective services caseworkers. As part of the study, the department shall: (1) consider: (A) the procedures for assigning cases; (B) the methods for managing caseloads; and (C) the factors considered in assigning scores to caseloads and assigning cases to caseworkers; (2) determine the appropriate guidelines for average caseloads for caseworkers in each department region; (3) determine the cost to implement any scoring system developed by the department; (4) ensure any scoring system developed by the department has the capability of producing monthly reports that include information for each department region; and (5) compare the caseloads for caseworkers in each department region with: (A) the caseloads of child protective services caseworkers in other states; or (B) national best practices. (b) Not later than September 1, 2020, the department shall report the results of the study and any recommendations to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and chairs of the standing committees of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over child protection issues. (c) This section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *