By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1386 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to training and development activities for persons who may interact with an individual with autism or other pervasive developmental disorder. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 114.013, Human Resources Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: (b) As part of coordinating resources under Subsection (a), the commission shall: (1) collect and distribute information and research regarding autism and other pervasive developmental disorders; (2) conduct training and development activities for persons who may interact with an individual with autism or another pervasive developmental disorder in the course of their employment, including school, medical, and [or] law enforcement personnel, and personnel of the Department of Family and Protective Services; (3) coordinate with local entities that provide services to an individual with autism or another pervasive developmental disorder; and (4) provide support for families affected by autism and other pervasive developmental disorders. (c) The commission shall ensure that training and development activities under this section are: (1) evidenced-based; (2) applicable to the professional role of each type of personnel to be trained under Subsection (b)(2); and (3) instructive regarding means of effectively communicating and engaging with individuals with limited social or verbal abilities. (d) At least once every five years, in consultation with an institution of higher education, the commission shall revise the materials and methods for the training and development activities to be provided under Subsection (b)(2). SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2024, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall revise the materials and methods for the training and development activities to be provided under Section 114.013(b)(2), Human Resources Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *