Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1409 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2019

                    By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 1409
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Property Tax; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualification of land for appraisal for ad valorem
 tax purposes as timber land or restricted-use timber land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.72, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 23.72.  QUALIFICATION FOR PRODUCTIVITY APPRAISAL. (a)
 Land qualifies for appraisal as provided by this subchapter if it is
 currently and actively devoted principally to production of timber
 or forest products to the degree of intensity generally accepted in
 the area with intent to produce income and has been devoted
 principally to production of timber or forest products or to
 agricultural use that would qualify the land for appraisal under
 Subchapter C or D [of this chapter] for five of the preceding seven
 years.
 (b)  In determining whether land is currently and actively
 devoted principally to the production of timber or forest products
 to the degree of intensity generally accepted in an area, a chief
 appraiser may not consider the purpose for which a portion of a
 parcel of land is used if the portion is:
 (1)  used for the production of timber or forest
 products, including a road, right-of-way, buffer area, or
 firebreak; or
 (2)  subject to a right-of-way that was taken through
 the exercise of the power of eminent domain.
 (c)  For the purpose of the appraisal of land under this
 subchapter, a portion of a parcel of land described by Subsection
 (b) is considered land that qualifies for appraisal under this
 subchapter if the remainder of the parcel of land qualifies for
 appraisal under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 23, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.765 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.765.  OIL AND GAS OPERATIONS ON LAND. The
 eligibility of land for appraisal under this subchapter does not
 end because a lessee under an oil and gas lease begins conducting
 oil and gas operations over which the Railroad Commission of Texas
 has jurisdiction on the land if the portion of the land on which oil
 and gas operations are not being conducted otherwise continues to
 qualify for appraisal under this subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  Section 23.9802, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  In determining whether land qualifies for appraisal as
 provided by this subchapter, a chief appraiser may not consider the
 purpose for which a portion of a parcel of land is used if the
 portion is:
 (1)  used for the production of timber or forest
 products, including a road, right-of-way, buffer area, or
 firebreak; or
 (2)  subject to a right-of-way that was taken through
 the exercise of the power of eminent domain.
 (e)  For the purpose of the appraisal of land under this
 subchapter, a portion of a parcel of land described by Subsection
 (d) is considered land that qualifies for appraisal under this
 subchapter if the remainder of the parcel of land qualifies for
 appraisal under this subchapter.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter H, Chapter 23, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.9808 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.9808.  OIL AND GAS OPERATIONS ON LAND. The
 eligibility of land for appraisal under this subchapter does not
 end because a lessee under an oil and gas lease begins conducting
 oil and gas operations over which the Railroad Commission of Texas
 has jurisdiction on the land if the portion of the land on which oil
 and gas operations are not being conducted otherwise continues to
 qualify for appraisal under this subchapter.
 SECTION 5.  (a) Sections 23.72 and 23.9802, Tax Code, as
 amended by this Act, apply only to the appraisal of land for ad
 valorem tax purposes for a tax year that begins on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 (b)  Sections 23.765 and 23.9808, Tax Code, as added by this
 Act, do not affect an additional tax imposed as a result of a change
 of use of land appraised under Subchapter E or H, Chapter 23, Tax
 Code, that occurred before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *