Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1435 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Thompson of Brazoria H.B. No. 1435
 (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell, Miles, Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inspection of a municipal solid waste management
 facility or site by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 before a permit application is issued, amended, extended, or
 renewed.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 361.088, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  Before a permit for a proposed municipal solid waste
 management facility is issued, amended, extended, or renewed, the
 commission shall inspect the facility or site used or proposed to be
 used to store, process, or dispose of municipal solid waste to
 confirm information included in the permit application.  The
 commission by rule shall prescribe the kinds of information in a
 permit application that require confirmation under this
 subsection.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for a permit, license, registration, or other
 authorization for a municipal solid waste facility that is filed
 with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An application for a permit, license,
 registration, or other authorization for a municipal solid waste
 facility that is filed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date of filing, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *