Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1468 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2019

                    86R8180 SOS-D
 By: Talarico H.B. No. 1468


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force to examine the
 effectiveness of school counseling programs provided for students
 enrolled in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.038 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.038.  PUBLIC SCHOOL MENTAL HEALTH TASK FORCE;
 REPORT. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Public school chief executive officer" means the
 superintendent of a school district or the chief executive officer
 of an open-enrollment charter school.
 (2)  "Public school mental health professional" means a
 person who provides counseling services in a public school and is:
 (A)  a counselor certified under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 21;
 (B)  a licensed physician who is:
 (i)  a graduate of an accredited psychiatric
 residency training program; or
 (ii)  certified in psychiatry by:
 (a)  the American Board of Psychiatry
 and Neurology; or
 (b)  the American Osteopathic Board of
 Neurology and Psychiatry;
 (C)  an advanced practice registered nurse, as
 defined by Section 301.152, Occupations Code, who holds a
 nationally recognized board certification in psychiatric or mental
 health nursing;
 (D)  a psychologist, as defined by Section
 501.002, Occupations Code;
 (E)  a licensed professional counselor, as
 defined by Section 503.002, Occupations Code; or
 (F)  a licensed clinical social worker, as defined
 by Section 505.002, Occupations Code.
 (b)  The Public School Mental Health task force is
 established under this section to examine the effectiveness of
 school counseling programs provided for students enrolled in public
 schools.
 (c)  The task force is composed of the following 25 members
 appointed by the commissioner:
 (1)  10 public school mental health professionals;
 (2)  five public school chief executive officers;
 (3)  four representatives of regional education
 service centers who have experience with school counseling;
 (4)  one representative of the State Board of
 Education;
 (5)  one representative of the agency;
 (6)  two representatives of professional counseling
 organizations; and
 (7)  two representatives of research organizations
 that have conducted academic research on school counseling.
 (d)  The commissioner shall appoint the members of the task
 force not later than December 31, 2020. The commissioner shall fill
 a vacancy in the task force by the appointment of another person
 with the same qualifications as the original appointee.
 (e)  The representative of the agency shall serve as the
 presiding officer of the task force.
 (f)  The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of
 the task force on or before January 31, 2021. The task force shall
 meet at least twice each year in Austin, Texas, and at other times
 and places that the presiding officer determines are appropriate.
 (g)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 (h)  The task force shall:
 (1)  examine whether public schools are using school
 counseling programs, including the national framework developed by
 the American School Counselor Association;
 (2)  examine other existing measures used by schools
 that positively affect student mental health;
 (3)  determine which school counseling programs
 achieve the best performance, considering the cost of the program,
 the number of students served, and the effectiveness of the
 program;
 (4)  determine which school counseling programs
 schools prefer to use; and
 (5)  conduct a statistical analysis, incorporating
 information on student demographics, including student family
 average income, to determine the overall effectiveness of school
 counseling programs and the impact on student achievement and
 performance.
 (i)  Not later than August 31, 2022, the task force shall
 deliver a report to the commissioner detailing the task force's
 findings and recommendations and the results of the statistical
 analysis conducted by the task force.
 (j)  The task force is abolished, and this section expires,
 December 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.