Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1516 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2019

                    By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Miles, Creighton) H.B. No. 1516
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the intercollegiate athletics fee at Texas Southern
 University; authorizing the continued imposition of a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 54.5223(g) and (h), Education Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *