Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1526 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    By: Bell of Montgomery (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 1526
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
 May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Property
 Tax; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the treatment of a nursery stock weather protection
 unit as an implement of husbandry for ad valorem tax purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.161, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 11.161.  IMPLEMENTS OF HUSBANDRY. (a) Machinery and
 equipment items that are used in the production of farm or ranch
 products or of timber, regardless of their primary design, are
 considered to be implements of husbandry and are exempt from ad
 valorem taxation.
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a), a nursery stock weather
 protection unit, as defined by Section 71.041, Agriculture Code, is
 considered to be an implement of husbandry.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2020.
 * * * * *