Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB162 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2019

                    By: White (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 162
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period of certain driver's license suspensions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.293, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.293.  PERIOD OF SUSPENSION UNDER SECTION 521.292.
 If [(a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), if] the person does
 not request a hearing, the period of license suspension under
 Section 521.292 is 90 days.
 [(b)     If the department determines that the person engaged in
 conduct described by Section 521.292(a)(1), the period of license
 suspension is extended for an additional period of the lesser of:
 [(1)  the term of the original suspension; or
 [(2)  one year.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.312(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c)[, Section
 521.293(b),] or Subchapter O, the department may not suspend a
 license for a period that exceeds one year.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a driver's license suspension based on conduct that occurred on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A driver's license
 suspension based on conduct that occurred before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the conduct
 occurred, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose. For purposes of this Act, conduct occurred before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the conduct occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *